+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2020 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-319)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 23, 2019 at 1:08 p.m. on May 23, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-319.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1115
- Third Reading Passed
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 803
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Votes (2)
May 23, 2019: Roll 1115
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Roll 803
- Yeas: 97
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor