+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1203
- Ward motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1204
- Ward motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee on Judiciary
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Warren first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 563
- Nordgren intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 564
- Engrossed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 21, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2017: Roll 1203
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
May 17, 2017: Roll 1204
- Yeas: 27
- Present/NV: 8
April 20, 2017: Roll 563
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 11
April 20, 2017: Roll 564
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor