+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-200)
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Assigned Act No. 2018-200.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 551
- Third Reading Passed
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 116
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 1, 2018: Roll 551
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 13
January 30, 2018: Roll 116
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 80
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor