+ − Effective Date
- January 01, 2023
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (38)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Stringer motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 577
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Requested
- Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 537 P&PO appoints Allen, Barfoot and Singleton
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Conference Committee Appointed
- Conference Committee on HB272 2022RS first Substitute Offered
- Conference Report
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conference Report Concurrence Requested
- Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 555
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Concurred in Conference Report
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 3:05 p.m. on March 10, 2022.
- Assigned Act No. 2022-133.
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Stringer motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 507 House appoints Jones (M), Stringer and Howard
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 476
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 477
- Scofield first Substitute Offered
- Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 478
- Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 479
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Public Safety and Homeland Security 1st Amendment Offered
- Public Safety and Homeland Security 2nd Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 275
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 276
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 277
- Easterbrook intended vote "Yea"
- Engrossed
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (7)
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2022: Reed motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 537 P&PO appoints Allen, Barfoot and Singleton Vote
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 8
March 10, 2022: Reed motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 555 Vote
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
March 10, 2022: Stringer motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 577 Vote
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 2
March 9, 2022: Stringer motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 507 House appoints Jones (M), Stringer and Howard Vote
- Yeas: 71
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 16
March 3, 2022: Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 476 Vote
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 8
March 3, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 480 Vote
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
March 3, 2022: Scofield motion to Table adopted Roll Call 477 Vote
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 7
March 3, 2022: Waggoner motion to Miscellaneous adopted Roll Call 478 Vote
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 5
March 3, 2022: Scofield motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 479 Vote
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor