+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-84)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-84.
- Delivered to Governor at 4:02 p.m. on February 6, 2018.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 288
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 118
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
February 6, 2018: Roll 288
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
January 30, 2018: Roll 118
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 89
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor