+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation Education
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
- Engrossed
On April 30, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Ways and Means Education Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 917
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 918
On April 25, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 24, 2024 in the House:
- Ways and Means Education 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means Education
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
April 30, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 917 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
April 30, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 918 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor