+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Forwarded to Governor on May 20, 2013 at 10:25 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-354.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 847
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 706
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 963
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 964
- Engrossed
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1128
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 7, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 847
- Yeas: 19
- Nays: 11
May 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 706
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 8
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 963
- Yeas: 101
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor