+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:45 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-372.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
- Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 307
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 216
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 215
- Baker Amendment Offered
- Baker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 214
- Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1078
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 3
April 4, 2013: Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 307
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
March 19, 2013: Baker motion to Table adopted Roll Call 214
- Yeas: 96
March 19, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 215
- Yeas: 91
- Nays: 2
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor