+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-417)
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Orr Amendment Offered
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 31, 2019 at 3:48 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1448
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1447
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Coleman motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1265
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2019-417 on 06/06/2019.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education Policy
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Sorrell intended to vote "Nay"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1000
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1265
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
May 31, 2019: Roll 1447
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
May 31, 2019: Roll 1448
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
May 23, 2019: Roll 1000
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor