+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 21, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 759
- Third Reading Passed
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation, Shelby County
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Mooney intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 542
- Third Reading Passed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Shelby County Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
April 21, 2016: Roll 759
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 12, 2016: Roll 542
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 85
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor