+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-529)
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor on May 31, 2019 at 4:11 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1462
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2019-529.
- Delivered to Governor at 4:11 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 279
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 278
- Constitution, Campaigns and Elections Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2019: Roll 1462
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 18, 2019: Roll 278
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
April 18, 2019: Roll 279
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor