+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2024 in the House:
- Currently Indefinitely Postponed
- Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On April 16, 2024 in the House:
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Ways and Means Education 1st Amendment
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Re-referred to Committee in House of Origin
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor