+ − Effective Date
- July 01, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-298.
- Concurrence Requested
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083
- Finance and Taxation Education Amendment Offered
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Bedsole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Forwarded to Governor at 11:30 p.m. on April 7, 2022.
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 355
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 354
- Bedsole Amendment Offered
- Bedsole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 353
- Third Reading Passed
- Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 3, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2022: Bedsole motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1025 Vote
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
April 7, 2022: Gudger motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1082 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 7, 2022: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1083 Vote
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor