+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 371
On February 23, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Votes (3)
April 4, 2017: Roll 371
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 9
March 2, 2017: Roll 190
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
February 16, 2017: Roll 57
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor