+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On September 17, 2018 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2018-280)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
- Assigned Act No. 2018-280.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Johnson (K) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 802
- Concurrence Requested
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Blackwell motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 777
- Brewbaker first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 778
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Brewbaker motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 258
- Third Reading Passed
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 18, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Financial Services
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2018: Roll 802
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2018: Roll 777
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
March 13, 2018: Roll 778
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
February 8, 2018: Roll 258
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor