+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-304)
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2019-304.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on May 23, 2019l.
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- England motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 883
- Concurrence Requested
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 362
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Smitherman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 361
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 126
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
May 22, 2019: Roll 883
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 10
April 23, 2019: Roll 361
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 23, 2019: Roll 362
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 4, 2019: Roll 126
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor