+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-94)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-94.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 359
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 124
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 23, 2019: Roll 359
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 7
April 4, 2019: Roll 124
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor