+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-503.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Enrolled
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 56
- Third Reading Passed
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On August 5, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 17
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Rereferred from Ways and Means Education to Ways and Means General Fund
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Votes (2)
August 10, 2015: Roll 56
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
August 5, 2015: Roll 17
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 17
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor