+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
- Assigned Act No. 2013-400.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184
- Third Reading Passed
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Commerce, Transportation, and Utilities
On April 4, 2013 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 296
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Vote
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1184
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2