+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2013-211.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Governmental Affairs first Substitute Offered
- Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 815
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 816
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Harper motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1077
- Enrolled
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- County and Municipal Government Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 363
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364
- Engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 2, 2013: Harper motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1077
- Yeas: 98
May 2, 2013: Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 815
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 816
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 2
April 24, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
- Yeas: 6
April 9, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 363
- Yeas: 94
- Nays: 1