+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-280)
On May 22, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:45 p.m. on May 22, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-280.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 21, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 936
- Third Reading Passed
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Mooney intended to vote "Yea"
- Scott intended in vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 176
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 175
- Ellis Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Votes (3)
May 21, 2019: Roll 936
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 11, 2019: Roll 175
- Yeas: 99
- Present/NV: 5
April 11, 2019: Roll 176
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor