+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Orr motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1168
- Orr motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1176
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Banking and Insurance as Favorable
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Commerce and Small Business Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 427
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 428
- Coleman intended to vot e"Yea"
- Engrossed
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Commerce and Small Business
+ − Votes (4)
May 17, 2017: Roll 1168
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 10
May 17, 2017: Roll 1176
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 9
April 6, 2017: Roll 427
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
April 6, 2017: Roll 428
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor