+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (19)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-186)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 2:47 p.m. on May 8, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-186.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 611
- Third Reading Passed
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Engrossed
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Shaver intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 310
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 309
- Wingo Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions
+ − Votes (3)
May 7, 2019: Roll 611
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
April 23, 2019: Roll 309
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
April 23, 2019: Roll 310
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor