+ − Effective Date
- August 01, 2023
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On July 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enacted
On May 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ready to Enroll
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- On Third Reading in Second House
- Read a Third Time and Pass
On May 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in Second House
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Read First Time in Second House
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- On Third Reading in House of Origin
- Adopt
- Adopt
- Read a Third Time and Pass
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- AMD/SUB
- AMD/SUB
- Reported Favorably
- Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin
- Read Second Time in House of Origin
On March 22, 2023 in the House:
- Carry Over
On February 8, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (4)
May 16, 2023: Read a Third Time and Pass Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 90
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
- Absent: 8
April 20, 2023: Adopt Vote
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 5
- Absent: 6
April 20, 2023: Read a Third Time and Pass Vote
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor