+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 321
- Third Reading Passed
On March 2, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 16, 2017 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2017: Roll 321
- Yeas: 88
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 6
February 23, 2017: Roll 126
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor