+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Waggoner motion to Indefinitely Postpone adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Indefinitely Postponed
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Cosponsors Added
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 891
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 890
- Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 889
- Health first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Health
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
March 19, 2014: Cosponsors Added
- Yeas: 76
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2014: Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 889
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 30
March 19, 2014: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 890
- Yeas: 100
March 19, 2014: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 891
- Yeas: 98
- Absent: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor