+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 30, 2021 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postponed in House of Origin
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postponed
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 326
- Orr motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 325
- Orr Amendment Offered
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor