+ − Effective Date
- February 23, 2022
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2022-37.
- Delivered to Governor at 2:54 p.m. on February 22, 2022.
- Enrolled
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Clerk of the House Certification
On February 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 340
- Third Reading Passed
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 15, 2022 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 136
- Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 137
- Cosponsors Added
- Hurst and Oliver intended to vote "Yea"
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2022 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor