+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Judiciary first Amendment Offered
- Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary with 1 amendment
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 846
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 703
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 859
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 858
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On March 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 12, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (5)
May 7, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 846
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 11
May 7, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 703
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 8
April 25, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 858
- Yeas: 85
April 25, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 859
- Yeas: 94
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor