+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read Second Time in Second House
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 15 Favorable from Judiciary
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Treadaway intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 107
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 106
- Chestnut Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 105
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 4, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
February 23, 2021: Roll 105
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
February 23, 2021: Roll 106
- Yeas: 96
- Present/NV: 8
February 23, 2021: Roll 107
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor