+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Pending third reading on day 23 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 304
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Beech intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 241
- Third Reading Passed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (3)
April 18, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 8
April 4, 2013: Marsh Tabled Marsh Motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 304
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 7
April 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 241
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor