+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-399.
- Delivered to Governor at 11:59 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1276
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered
- Fielding motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Fielding first Substitute Offered
- Fielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1177
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1178
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
- Marsh table Marsh motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 648
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 574
- Poole Amendment Offered
- Boman motion to Table lost Roll Call 575
- Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 576
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 577
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 578
- Engrossed
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (9)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1178
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 20, 2013: DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1276
- Yeas: 98
- Nays: 1
May 20, 2013: Fielding motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1177
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 2, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
- Yeas: 9
April 30, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 648
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 8
April 16, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 574
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 10
- Absent: 4
April 16, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 577
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 17
April 16, 2013: Boman motion to Table lost Roll Call 575
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 72
April 16, 2013: Hammon motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 576
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 28
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor