+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 18, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 16, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 547
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on County and Municipal Government
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Votes (2)
April 11, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 547 Vote
- Yeas: 103
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor