+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On April 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Read Second Time in Second House
On April 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On March 19, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Judiciary Engrossed Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 256
- Passed House Of Origin
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 257
- Engrossed
On March 19, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 6, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Amendment Adopted
- Committee Engrossed Substitute Adopted
On February 22, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (3)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (3)
March 19, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 1
March 19, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 256 Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 2
March 19, 2024: Passed House Of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor