+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 364
- Third Reading Passed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund
+ − Vote
February 15, 2018: Roll 364
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 12
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor