+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1011
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 702
- Pending third reading on day 30 Favorable from Constitution, Campaign Finance, Ethics, and Elections
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 853
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Constitution, Campaigns and Elections
+ − Votes (3)
May 9, 2013: Marsh table Marsh motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 1011
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 8
May 2, 2013: Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 702
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 10
April 25, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 853
- Yeas: 95