+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
- On Third Reading in Second House
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On April 23, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Colvin 1st Amendment Offered
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 750
On April 11, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On April 10, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
On February 21, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 8, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 17
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 7
April 23, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 86
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 15
April 23, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 750 Vote
- Yeas: 89
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 3
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor