+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 4:16 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
- Assigned Act No. 2015-457.
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Passed Second House
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1467
- Third Reading Passed
On June 4, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On May 7, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 598
- Third Reading Passed
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Votes (2)
June 4, 2015: Roll 1467
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 13
May 7, 2015: Roll 598
- Yeas: 81
- Present/NV: 24
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor