+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Pending third reading on day 18 Favorable from Judiciary
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On February 26, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160
On February 14, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
April 4, 2013: Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Yeas: 7
February 26, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 160
- Yeas: 95
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor