+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-260.
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 2:42 p.m. pn May 20, 2013.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 20, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1036
On May 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
- Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 933
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
- Smitherman motion to rerefer
- Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 685
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 505
- Newton (D) motion to reconsider adopted ROLL CALL 506
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 507
On February 28, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
May 20, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1036
- Yeas: 28
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2013: Dial table Dial motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 933
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 8
May 2, 2013: Orr motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 685
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 11
April 16, 2013: Newton (D) motion to reconsider adopted ROLL CALL 506
- Yeas: 81
- Absent: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor