+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Enacted (Act 2018-184)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2018-184.
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ward motion to adopt Local Application Resolution adopted Roll Call 676
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 675
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Delivered to Secretary of State at 1:42 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
On March 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Martin motion to Local Application adopted Roll Call 93
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 92
- Third Reading Passed
On January 23, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (4)
March 8, 2018: Roll 675
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
March 8, 2018: Roll 676
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 11
January 25, 2018: Roll 92
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 37
January 25, 2018: Roll 93
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 63
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor