+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (24)
On May 8, 2024 in the Senate:
- Third Reading in Second House
- Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute Offered
- Chambliss motion to Table - Adopted Voice Vote
- Chambliss 1st Substitute Offered
- Carried Over to the Call of the Chair
- Chambliss 1st Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1173
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1174
- Passed by Second House
On May 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
On May 1, 2024 in the Senate:
- Finance and Taxation General Fund 1st Substitute
- Reported Out of Committee Second House
On April 2, 2024 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in Second House
On March 21, 2024 in the House:
- Third Reading in House of Origin
- Ways and Means General Fund 1st Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 301
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 302
- Engrossed
On February 28, 2024 in the House:
- Reported Out of Committee House of Origin
- Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
- Committee Substitute Adopted
On February 20, 2024 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means General Fund
- Pending Committee Action in House of Origin
+ − Fiscal Notes (4)
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (6)
May 8, 2024: Third Reading in Second House Vote
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
May 8, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 1173 Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 8, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 1174 Vote
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 21, 2024: Third Reading in House of Origin Vote
- Yeas: 100
- Absent: 2
March 21, 2024: Motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 301 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 1
March 21, 2024: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 302 Vote
- Yeas: 101
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor