+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Beckman intended to vote "Yea" on the passage of HB20 on the 4th Leg Day
- Assigned Act No. 2015-5 on 03/20/2015.
- Delivered to Governor at 7:10 p.m. on March 18, 2015.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Passed Second House
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 135
On March 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 38
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2015: Roll 135
- Yeas: 21
- Present/NV: 14
March 11, 2015: Roll 38
- Yeas: 41
- Present/NV: 64
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor