+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 6:49 p.m. on August 10, 2015.
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 64
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Livingston motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Third Reading Passed
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2015-516.
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 63
- Holtzclaw Amendment Offered
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Concurrence Requested
- Hanes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 44
On August 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
- Signature Requested
On August 10, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Clerk of the House Certification
On August 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
On August 6, 2015 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27
- Third Reading Passed
On August 4, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On August 3, 2015 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (4)
August 10, 2015: Roll 44
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 17
August 10, 2015: Roll 63
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 7
August 10, 2015: Roll 64
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 7
August 6, 2015: Roll 27
- Yeas: 65
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 37
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor