+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 569
- Hanes first Substitute Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Howard motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 73
- State Government Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 12, 2016: Roll 570
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
April 12, 2016: Roll 569
- Yeas: 94
- Present/NV: 11
March 22, 2016: Roll 341
- Yeas: 105
March 22, 2016: Roll 342
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
March 15, 2016: Roll 385
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 6
February 23, 2016: Roll 72
- Yeas: 85
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 18
February 23, 2016: Roll 73
- Yeas: 95
- Present/NV: 10
February 23, 2016: Roll 82
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor