+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (57)
On September 17, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-2)
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chambliss motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:21 p.m. on March 12, 2019.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
- Third Reading Passed
- Roberts Amendment Offered
- Marsh motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 28
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2019-2.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 7
- Weaver and Treadaway intended to vote "Nay"
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 10
- Holmes Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 9
- McCampbell Amendment #1 Offered
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 8
- Hill Amendment Offered
- Rowe Amendment Offered
- Rogers Amendment Offered
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 6
- Hurst Amendment Offered
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 5
- Jackson Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 4
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 11
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 3
- Givan Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Hanes Amendment Offered
- Warren 2nd Amendment Offered
- Harbison Amendment Offered
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 12
- Engrossed
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Transportation and Energy
On March 8, 2019 in the House:
- Hatcher intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 18
- Hill intended to vote "Yea"
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 17
- Wingo Amendment #2 Offered
- Poole motion to Table adopted Roll Call 16
- Howard Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 15
- McCampbell 2nd Amendment Offered
- Wingo motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote
- Wingo Amendment #1 Offered - withdrawn
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 14
- Warren motion to withdraw her amendment adopted Voice Vote
- Warren 1st Amendment Offered -withdrawn
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 13
- Poole Amendment Offered
On March 7, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Transportation, Utilities and Infrastructure
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (17)
March 12, 2019: Roll 28
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2019: Roll 11
- Yeas: 84
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 11
March 8, 2019: Roll 12
- Yeas: 82
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 8
March 8, 2019: Roll 13
- Yeas: 102
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2019: Roll 14
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 4
March 8, 2019: Roll 15
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 5
March 8, 2019: Roll 16
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2019: Roll 17
- Yeas: 101
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
March 8, 2019: Roll 18
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 2
March 8, 2019: Roll 3
- Yeas: 78
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 16
March 8, 2019: Roll 4
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
March 8, 2019: Roll 5
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 13
March 8, 2019: Roll 6
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 10
March 8, 2019: Roll 7
- Yeas: 79
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
March 8, 2019: Roll 8
- Yeas: 83
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 14
March 8, 2019: Roll 10
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 11
March 8, 2019: Roll 9
- Yeas: 98
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor