+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On May 22, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-325)
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned Act No. 2021-325.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On April 29, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:11 a.m. on April 29, 2021.
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Concurred in Second House Amendment
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Holmes motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 993
- Concurrence Requested
On April 22, 2021 in the House:
- Holmes motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
- Concurrence Requested
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Butler Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
- Orr motion to Table adopted Voice Vote
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Butler motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1060
- Stutts motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1061
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1062
- Stutts Amendment Offered
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Smitherman motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Carried Over
On April 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 389
- Third Reading Passed
- Judiciary Amendment Offered
- Engrossed
- Holmes Amendment Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 390
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 391
- Cosponsors Added
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Votes (8)
April 27, 2021: Roll 993
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
April 20, 2021: Roll 1061
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
April 20, 2021: Roll 1062
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
April 20, 2021: Roll 1060
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2021: Roll 390
- Yeas: 100
- Present/NV: 3
March 11, 2021: Roll 391
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
March 11, 2021: Roll 392
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 24
March 11, 2021: Roll 389
- Yeas: 101
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor