+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2019-154)
On May 7, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 3:53 p.m. on May 7, 2019.
- Assigned Act No. 2019-154.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 511
- Third Reading Passed
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 8
- Third Reading Passed
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2019: Roll 511
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 5
March 21, 2019: Roll 8
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 83
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor