+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Clerk of the House Certification
- Assigned Act No. 2013-209.
- Delivered to Governor at 12:20 p.m. on May 7, 2013.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 2, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Second House
- Enrolled
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Passed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading Passed
- Insurance first Substitute Offered
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 652
- Engrossed
On February 21, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
On February 7, 2013 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (2)
May 2, 2013: Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 799
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 4
April 18, 2013: Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 651
- Yeas: 98
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor