+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 24, 2021 in the House:
- Enacted (Act 2021-430)
On May 6, 2021 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor at 10:49 a.m. on May 6, 2021.
- Assigned Act No. 2021-430.
- Clerk of the House Certification
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signature Requested
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Passed Second House
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1340
- Third Reading Passed
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Engrossed
- Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 751
- Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 750
- Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered
- Third Reading Passed
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
On February 2, 2021 in the House:
- Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (3)
May 4, 2021: Roll 1340
- Yeas: 28
- Present/NV: 6
April 13, 2021: Roll 750
- Yeas: 82
- Present/NV: 21
April 13, 2021: Roll 751
- Yeas: 90
- Present/NV: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor